|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 502, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1979.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 9).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 1586.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on B., F. & I. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1630.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 13).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS. by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and INS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|