California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1052 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill August 19, 2009
Bill August 17, 2009
Bill July 14, 2009
Bill July 1, 2009
Bill June 17, 2009