|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4768.)
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator DeSaulnier.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 1730.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 30).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|