|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 270, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3269.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice waived. (Page 3202.) From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 9).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2213.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1858.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|