|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 568, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6798.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6680.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4819.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 18).
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Joint Rules 61(b)(15) and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4589.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1454.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|