|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 3355.)
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice waived. (Page 3255.) From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (September 10).
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 16. Page 2210.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 19. Noes 17. Page 2071.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Wolk. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2072.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 2041.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|