|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 133, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Withdrawn from Governor. Ordered returned to enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 1375.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1461.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|