|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 272, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2803.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 1964.)
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1723.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|