|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 134, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2472.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1668.)
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1723.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1659.).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|