|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2794.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1979.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1966.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|