|
06/23/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3912.)
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (January 21).
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 11).
|
|
|
|
01/11/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3746.)
|
|
|
|
01/07/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 7).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|