07/01/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/09/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/04/2009 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/21/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/21/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1630.) | |||
05/18/2009 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
05/14/2009 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 13). | |||
04/30/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 29). | |||
04/15/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/14/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |