06/24/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/26/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
05/14/2009 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
05/04/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/04/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1241.) | |||
04/29/2009 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
04/28/2009 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 27). | |||
04/15/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
04/14/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/13/2009 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |