02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
01/11/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/20/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/26/2009 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |