BILL NUMBER: AB 1108AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 20, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 17, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 9, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 17, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 15, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 29, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 4, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 22, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Fuentes ( Coauthor: Assembly Member Bradford ) FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to add and repeal Section 2800 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to utility service. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1108, as amended, Fuentes. Electric and gas utility service: master-meter customers. Existing law authorizes the owner of a master-metered mobilehome park or manufactured housing community that provides gas or electric service to residents to transfer ownership and operational responsibility for its gas or electric system to the gas or electrical corporation providing service in the area in which the park or community is located, pursuant to specified transfer and cost allocation procedures. This bill would require the Public Utilities Commission, by July 1, 2011, to open an investigation or other appropriate proceeding to evaluate and report to the Legislature, by January 1,20132014 , when an owner of amaster-meteredmobilehome park or manufactured housing community that provides master-metered gas or electric service to its residents of the park or community should be required to transfer responsibility for gas or electric service to the gas or electrical corporation providing service in the area in which the park or community is located, along with those plant, facilities, and interests in real property that the commission, in consultation with the gas or electrical corporation , determines are necessary, convenient, or cost effective to provide service. The bill would require the commission toconsult with the Department of Housing and Community Development and county departments of weights and measures, to identify those master-metered mobilehome parks and manufactured housing communities with unsafe or substandard conditions that should be transferredinclude in the report a recommended phase-in schedule for potential transfers, the estimated costs and benefits to the gas or electrical corporations for the transfer of responsibility, and the potential benefits or costs to affected residents and ratepayers. The bill would require the commission, in consultation with the Department of Housing and Community Development, to develop a system for any inspections that may be necessary to define, find, determine, or prioritize unsafe or substandard master-metered systems, but the bill would specify that this provision not be interpreted to require physical inspections of gas or electric systems . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2800 is added to the Public Utilities Code, to read: 2800. (a) By July 1, 2011, the commission shall open an investigation or other appropriate proceeding to evaluate and report to the Legislature when the owner of amaster-meteredmobilehome park or manufactured housing community that providesgas or electric service tomaster-metered gas or electric service to its residents should be required to transfer responsibility for gas or electric service to the gas or electrical corporation providing service in the area in which the park or community is located, along with those plant, facilities, and interests in real property that thegas or electrical corporationcommission, in consultation with the gas or electrical corporation, determines are necessary, convenient, or cost effective to provide service.(b) The commission shall consult with the Department of Housing and Community Development and the county departments of weights and measures to identify those gas or electric systems with unsafe or substandard conditions that should be transferred. The report shall include a recommended phase-in schedule for the potential transfers and the estimated costs to the gas or electrical corporations for the transfers of responsibility.(b) The commission shall include in the report developed pursuant to subdivision (a) a recommended phase-in schedule for potential transfers, the estimated costs and benefits to the gas or electrical corporations for the transfer of responsibility, the potential costs or benefits to the residents currently served by the master-metered systems, and the potential benefits or costs to ratepayers. (c) As part of the investigation or proceeding required pursuant to subdivision (a), the commission, in consultation with the Department of Housing and Community Development, shall develop a system, including protocols, standards, or criteria, for any inspections that may be necessary to define, find, determine, or prioritize unsafe or substandard systems, as determined by the commission in consultation with the Department of Housing and Community Development, that should be transferred to a gas or electrical corporation. When developing this system, the commission shall consider safety or other complaint records to establish priorities for any necessary inspections. (d) This section shall not be interpreted to require physical inspections of gas or electric systems. To the extent feasible, the commission shall rely on existing data or information from sources such as a state or local agency, a gas or electrical corporation, or an owner of mobilehome park or manufactured housing community to prepare the report required pursuant to subdivision (a). Upon request by the commission or Department of Housing and Community Development, an owner of mobilehome park or manufactured housing community shall submit information on the location or type of its gas or electric system or any other reasonable information deemed necessary to prepare the report.(c)(e) The report shall balance the goal of providing residents of mobilehome parks and manufactured housing communities with gas and electric service that is as safe and reliable as that which the commission requires gas and electrical corporations to supply to residential customers and the requirement of fairness to the gas or electrical corporation's ratepayers, who have already reimbursed the master-meter customer for maintenance costs, operating costs, return on investment, and depreciation, as well as other costs associated with providingsubmeteredmaster-metered electric and gas service, through the rate differential afforded master-meter customers pursuant to Section 739.5.(d)(f) The commission shall report the plan to the Legislature no later than January 1,20132014 . The report shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code.(e)(g) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on January 1,20172018 .