02/02/2010 | Died on inactive file. | |||
06/02/2009 | To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Emmerson. | |||
05/26/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/21/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. | |||
05/06/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/05/2009 | Read second time and amended. | |||
05/04/2009 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 28). | |||
04/27/2009 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/23/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/22/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 21). From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/26/2009 | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |