|
09/10/2009
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 20. Noes 19. Page 2394.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 19. Noes 19. Page 2173.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hancock. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2173.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 30. Page 1886.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|