|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 3083.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 2074.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 19. Page 1748.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|