|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 138, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2382.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1429.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1626.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 12).
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|