|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 273, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3382.)
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2403.)
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2280.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1442.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|