California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1140 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Amended

Bill August 30, 2010
Bill August 12, 2010
Bill June 29, 2010
Bill April 14, 2009