|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 3373.)
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 17. Page 2371.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 5.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 1939.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|