LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1182
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1182
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1182
Compare Versions
AB1182 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB1182 Enrolled September 21, 2009
AB1182 Amended September 4, 2009
AB1182 Amended April 30, 2009
AB1182 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1182 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB1182 Enrolled September 21, 2009
AB1182 Amended September 4, 2009
AB1182 Amended April 30, 2009
AB1182 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare