|
10/14/2009
|
Joint Rule 61(a)(13) suspended. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2530.) Read third time and amended. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 2531.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 2531.)
|
|
|
|
09/12/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (September 11). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Joint Rule 61(a)(12) suspended. (Page 2429.) Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 2429.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 8).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2256.)
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Joint Rule 61(a)(12) suspended. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2222.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1860.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|