02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
05/13/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/30/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 29). | |||
04/13/2009 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |||
04/02/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent. | |||
03/26/2009 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |