08/27/2009 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
07/13/2009 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |||
06/24/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 23). | |||
06/11/2009 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |||
05/28/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/28/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 31. Page 1749.) | |||
05/26/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/21/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 20). | |||
04/29/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 28). | |||
03/26/2009 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |