BILL NUMBER: AB 1214CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 517 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 11, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 11, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 24, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 27, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 17, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 26, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 15, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Nava FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to add Section 16032 to the Insurance Code, relating to fire insurance. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1214, Nava. Fire insurance: underwriters' corps: liability. Existing law authorizes any domestic corporation of insurance underwriters to maintain an underwriters' corps. Under existing law, an underwriters' corps is defined as a group of persons with officers and equipment, maintained to discover and prevent fires and to save life and property from fire. This bill would specify that any privately owned or operated resources hired by an insurer for the purpose of protecting structures endangered by fire or performing firefighting duties shall report to the incident commander or his or her designee immediately upon arriving at the site of a fire. This bill would also require those resources to obey all directions, including evacuation orders, given by the incident commander or his or her designee. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 16032 is added to the Insurance Code, to read: 16032. Any privately owned or operated resources hired by an insurer for the purpose of protecting structures endangered by fire or performing firefighting duties shall report to the incident commander or his or her designee immediately upon arriving at the site of a fire. Those resources must obey all directions, including evacuation orders, given by the incident commander or his or her designee.