|
08/30/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Romero.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From Consent Calendar. To third reading. To inactive file on motion of Senator Lowenthal.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (July 1).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1556.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|