|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 143, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1761.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 1346.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|