|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 82, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1519.)
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 938.)
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24).
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
01/16/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 15.
|
|
|
|
01/15/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|