|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 631, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2750.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1927.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From inactive file. To second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From Consent Calendar. To third reading. To inactive file on motion of Senator Benoit.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (July 7).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1557.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 12).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|