LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1239
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1239
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1239
Compare Versions
AB1239 Enrolled September 1, 2010
AB1239 Amended August 19, 2010
AB1239 Amended June 7, 2010
AB1239 Amended April 19, 2010
AB1239 Amended January 25, 2010
AB1239 Amended January 4, 2010
AB1239 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1239 Enrolled September 1, 2010
AB1239 Amended August 19, 2010
AB1239 Amended June 7, 2010
AB1239 Amended April 19, 2010
AB1239 Amended January 25, 2010
AB1239 Amended January 4, 2010
AB1239 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare