LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1243
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1243
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1243
Compare Versions
AB1243 Amended August 18, 2009
AB1243 Amended July 14, 2009
AB1243 Amended June 29, 2009
AB1243 Amended June 1, 2009
AB1243 Amended April 14, 2009
AB1243 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1243 Amended August 18, 2009
AB1243 Amended July 14, 2009
AB1243 Amended June 29, 2009
AB1243 Amended June 1, 2009
AB1243 Amended April 14, 2009
AB1243 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare