02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
05/20/2009 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/13/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/27/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/23/2009 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/22/2009 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 22). | |||
03/31/2009 | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |