|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2897.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1843.)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
Ordered returned to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1470.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|