|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 2019.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 29. Page 1818.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|