|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 2324.)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 29. Page 1721.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Action rescinded and record expunged whereby a final roll call vote was taken.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|