|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 300, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6559.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on RULES pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Ordered placed on unfinished business file.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 4669.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to JR 61(b)(14).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1750.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|