LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB129
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB129
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB129
Compare Versions
AB129 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB129 Enrolled September 21, 2009
AB129 Amended September 2, 2009
AB129 Amended August 27, 2009
AB129 Amended May 4, 2009
AB129 Introduced January 16, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB129 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB129 Enrolled September 21, 2009
AB129 Amended September 2, 2009
AB129 Amended August 27, 2009
AB129 Amended May 4, 2009
AB129 Introduced January 16, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare