|
12/10/2009
|
(Corrected December 10.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 2021.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended. (Corrected March 16.)
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|