|
09/10/2009
|
Senate Rule 29.3 suspended.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 24).
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on EQ. and E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 3. Page 2477.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|