California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1319 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill August 27, 2009
Bill August 17, 2009
Bill July 14, 2009
Bill June 28, 2009
Bill June 15, 2009
Bill May 26, 2009
Bill April 15, 2009