|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. Passage refused in Senate. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2176.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Calderon. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2177.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1366.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|