|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 3273.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 2292.)
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 15).
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on E., R., & C.A. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on E., R., & C.A. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 29. Page 1718.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Action rescinded and record expunged whereby a final roll call vote was taken.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|