|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2889.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 2929.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 2009.)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 1920.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1728.).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|