LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB133
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB133
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB133
Compare Versions
AB133 Chaptered July 6, 2010
AB133 Enrolled June 22, 2010
AB133 Amended May 20, 2010
AB133 Amended January 4, 2010
AB133 Introduced January 20, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB133 Chaptered July 6, 2010
AB133 Enrolled June 22, 2010
AB133 Amended May 20, 2010
AB133 Amended January 4, 2010
AB133 Introduced January 20, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare