|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 6337.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4451.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1534.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|