02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
01/11/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
01/04/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
04/27/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/23/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). | |||
04/15/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
04/13/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/31/2009 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |