LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1343
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1343
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1343
Compare Versions
AB1343 Chaptered September 28, 2010
AB1343 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB1343 Amended August 31, 2010
AB1343 Amended July 13, 2009
AB1343 Amended June 24, 2009
AB1343 Amended May 4, 2009
AB1343 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1343 Chaptered September 28, 2010
AB1343 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB1343 Amended August 31, 2010
AB1343 Amended July 13, 2009
AB1343 Amended June 24, 2009
AB1343 Amended May 4, 2009
AB1343 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare