California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1354 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2010

Chaptered

Bill August 27, 2010

Amended

Bill June 24, 2010
Bill June 16, 2010